NY S05795 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.514
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to reporting school finances, reserve funds, final annual budgets and multi-year financial plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to reporting school finances, reserve funds, final annual budgets and multi-year financial plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31AssemblySIGNED CHAP.514
2016-12-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2016-06-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-06-08Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.53
2016-06-08Assemblysubstituted for a7675a
2016-05-24Assemblyreferred to education
2016-05-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-05-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-05-16SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5795A
2016-02-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2016-02-25Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2016-02-24Senate1ST REPORT CAL.225
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2016-01-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-01-06Assemblydied in assembly
2015-06-25Assemblyreferred to education
2015-06-25SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-06-25SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-06-25SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1897
2015-06-25SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2015-06-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07675 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s5795a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback