NY S05795 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting of crimes at mental hygiene facilities.
Title
Relates to reporting of crimes at mental hygiene facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.558 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.544 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8325 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1413 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08325 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - substituted by s5795