NY S05777 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to clarifying provisions prohibiting wage theft; provides that there are no exceptions to liability for failure to pay wages.
Title
Relates to clarifying provisions prohibiting wage theft; provides that there are no exceptions to liability for failure to pay wages.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.575 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07841 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to labor