NY S05776 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7522B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7522B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the treasurer for the Mattituck park district shall be appointed by the park commissioners rather than elected by the residents of such district; abolishes the three-year term limit for such treasurer.
Title
Provides that the treasurer for the Mattituck park district shall be appointed by the park commissioners rather than elected by the residents of such district; abolishes the three-year term limit for such treasurer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7522B |
2017-06-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5776B |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1113 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5776A |
2017-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07522 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - signed chap.358