NY S05776 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - VETOED MEMO.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - VETOED MEMO.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting funds of an industrial development agency to be used for certain retail projects in areas affected by disaster emergencies.
Title
Relates to permitting funds of an industrial development agency to be used for certain retail projects in areas affected by disaster emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.222 |
2013-09-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.663 |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a8025 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1409 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08025 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5776