NY S05769 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-09 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-09 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates state regulation of voice over internet protocol service in order to facilitate competition and ensure consumers receive the maximum benefit of competition.
Title
Eliminates state regulation of voice over internet protocol service in order to facilitate competition and ensure consumers receive the maximum benefit of competition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.551 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1374 |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08459 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions