NY S05765 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.554
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - SIGNED CHAP.554
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mobility vehicles and new mobility vehicles; defines terms.
Title
Relates to mobility vehicles and new mobility vehicles; defines terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.554 |
2015-11-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.689 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8003a |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1690 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08003 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5765