NY S05760 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.359
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.359
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes excess business disability insurance as a non-basic type of insurance.
Title
Authorizes excess business disability insurance as a non-basic type of insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.359 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.302 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a3222a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5760A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.743 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03222 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - substituted by s5760a