NY A03222 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s5760a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s5760a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes excess business disability insurance as a non-basic type of insurance.
Title
Authorizes excess business disability insurance as a non-basic type of insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s5760a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.302 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 3222a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05760 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.359