NY S05744 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to local civil administrative enforcement procedures in the town of Huntington and other municipalities.
Title
Relates to local civil administrative enforcement procedures in the town of Huntington and other municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.145 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.672 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a5959b |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2167 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5744B |
2017-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5744A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05959 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s5744b