NY S05734 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - VETOED MEMO.84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - VETOED MEMO.84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to charitable bail organizations.
Title
Relates to charitable bail organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.84 |
2011-11-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.292 |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a8158a |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1407 |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5734A |
2011-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08158 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - substituted by s5734a