NY S05729 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.187
Status: Introduced on June 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.187
Summary
Extends from December 1, 2009 until December 1, 2012, the expiration of the authority of the county of Hamilton to impose a mortgage tax.
Title
Extends from December 1, 2009 until December 1, 2012, the expiration of the authority of the county of Hamilton to impose a mortgage tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8629 | |
2009-06-30 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.689 | |
2009-06-30 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-01 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08629 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.187
S43213 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65046 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
S43213 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65046 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05729&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |