NY S05713 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - VETOED MEMO.303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - VETOED MEMO.303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts various provisions relating to procurement procedures.
Title
Enacts various provisions relating to procurement procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.303 |
2015-11-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.713 |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7513c |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1686 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5713B |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5713A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07513 (Same As) 2015-06-19 - substituted by s5713b