NY S05705 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing accidental disability retirement benefits for chief fire marshals, assistant chief fire marshals, division supervising fire marshals, supervising marshals, fire marshals and fire marshal trainees in Nassau County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing accidental disability retirement benefits for chief fire marshals, assistant chief fire marshals, division supervising fire marshals, supervising marshals, fire marshals and fire marshal trainees in Nassau County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29AssemblyVETOED MEMO.199
2017-11-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-15Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyhome rule request
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.339
2017-06-15Assemblysubstituted for a7127
2017-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-14SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2017-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1341
2017-04-26SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07127 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5705

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback