NY S05703 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in a city of one million or more flashing purple lights may be affixed to and displayed on buses operated on a bus rapid transit route.
Title
Provides that in a city of one million or more flashing purple lights may be affixed to and displayed on buses operated on a bus rapid transit route.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5703B |
2013-06-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5703A |
2013-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06076 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - held for consideration in transportation