NY S05692 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8275
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage fluke-summer flounder.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage fluke-summer flounder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8275 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1648 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08275 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.221