NY S05690 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A403A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A403A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to diagnosis-related groups and service intensity weights for total hip joint replacement and total knee joint replacement inpatient cases for a general hospital.
Title
Relates to diagnosis-related groups and service intensity weights for total hip joint replacement and total knee joint replacement inpatient cases for a general hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A403A |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1537 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00403 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - tabled