NY S05670 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates human organ delivery vehicles as authorized emergency vehicles which shall permit the operator of such vehicles certain privileges when involved in an emergency operation.
Title
Designates human organ delivery vehicles as authorized emergency vehicles which shall permit the operator of such vehicles certain privileges when involved in an emergency operation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.353 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03690 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - print number 3690a