NY S05660 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.313
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.313
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rates set by the Sandy Hook pilots surcharge board.
Title
Relates to the rates set by the Sandy Hook pilots surcharge board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.313 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.228 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a7737a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5660A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1078 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2015-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07737 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s5660a