NY S05658 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to party funds and restrictions on expenditures.
Title
Relates to party funds and restrictions on expenditures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8019 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1085 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08019 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.210