NY S05654 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to MRSA and other infectious skin disease protection and education; establishes the interscholastic wrestling health training and education program.
Title
Relates to MRSA and other infectious skin disease protection and education; establishes the interscholastic wrestling health training and education program.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1357 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5654A |
2012-05-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2011-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08292 (Same As) 2012-05-15 - print number 8292a