NY S05649 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides authority for the NYC housing development corporation to acquire mortgage loans made by the city or to acquire a participation interest in such mortgage loans and to make loans for the creation and preservation of affordable housing.
Title
Provides authority for the NYC housing development corporation to acquire mortgage loans made by the city or to acquire a participation interest in such mortgage loans and to make loans for the creation and preservation of affordable housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8242 |
2011-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1179 |
2011-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08242 (Same As) 2011-07-20 - signed chap.185