NY S05618 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of years of military service credit a member may purchase from three years to four years; provides that the provisions of such act shall not be subject to the requirement that the state shall make an equal payment to the retirement system.
Title
Increases the amount of years of military service credit a member may purchase from three years to four years; provides that the provisions of such act shall not be subject to the requirement that the state shall make an equal payment to the retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-04-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5618C |
2024-04-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-03-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5618B |
2024-03-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-10-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5618A |
2023-10-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-04-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05936 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - reported referred to rules