NY S05618 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division for small business to maintain a small business portal on the department of economic development's internet website; provides such portal shall be a one-stop source of information to existing and prospective small businesses.
Title
Directs the division for small business to maintain a small business portal on the department of economic development's internet website; provides such portal shall be a one-stop source of information to existing and prospective small businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-04-21 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-04-20 | 1ST REPORT CAL.411 | |
2010-02-04 | PRINT NUMBER 5618B | |
2010-02-04 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2010-02-02 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-05-28 | PRINT NUMBER 5618A | |
2009-05-28 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-05-21 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A2982-B (Same As) 2010-04-13 - reported referred to ways and means