NY S05590 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to implementing a new framework for the regulation of telecommunications and cable services.
Title
Relates to implementing a new framework for the regulation of telecommunications and cable services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-11-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5590A |
2011-11-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08229 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - print number 8229a