NY S05559 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5559A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5559A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mass transit photo device enforcement of owner liability for failure of an operator to comply with bus lane restrictions.
Title
Relates to mass transit photo device enforcement of owner liability for failure of an operator to comply with bus lane restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5559A |
2012-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1057 |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |