NY S05558 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Manhasset union free school district and Manhasset public library to take certain actions to correct an understatement in the certification of the 2020-2021 tax levy of such library.
Title
Authorizes the Manhasset union free school district and Manhasset public library to take certain actions to correct an understatement in the certification of the 2020-2021 tax levy of such library.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.642 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06473 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments