NY S05557 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8173B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8173B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain municipalities to approve a partial tax exemption for reconstruction, alterations or improvement to qualified residential structures.
Title
Authorizes certain municipalities to approve a partial tax exemption for reconstruction, alterations or improvement to qualified residential structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8173B |
2012-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5557B |
2012-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2012-02-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-02-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-02-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5557A |
2012-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.168 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08173 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.122