NY S05555 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to deposits on plans and specifications for contracts for public works.
Title
Relates to deposits on plans and specifications for contracts for public works.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
2013-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06896 (Same As) 2014-02-11 - REFERRED TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT