NY S05555 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7810
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows limited liability companies to operate renal disease diagnostic or treatment centers.
Title
Allows limited liability companies to operate renal disease diagnostic or treatment centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7810 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1140 |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07810 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - signed chap.492