NY S05529 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.412
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.412
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to on-premises license or permit for the provision of alcohol by a volunteer firefighters organization where a police office serving as an officer of such organization.
Title
Relates to on-premises license or permit for the provision of alcohol by a volunteer firefighters organization where a police office serving as an officer of such organization.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.412 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.517 |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | substituted for a7618b |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2014-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.304 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5529B |
2014-02-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5529A |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.843 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07618 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - substituted by s5529b