NY S05522 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the provision of off-site health care services; directs the commissioner of health to allow diagnostic and treatment centers and outpatient clinics of general hospitals to provide off-site services to existing patients who are chronically ill and temporarily or permanently homebound at their residence or a long term care facility.
Title
Relates to the provision of off-site health care services; directs the commissioner of health to allow diagnostic and treatment centers and outpatient clinics of general hospitals to provide off-site services to existing patients who are chronically ill and temporarily or permanently homebound at their residence or a long term care facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5522C |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1143 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5522B |
2015-06-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5522A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1070 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07714 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - signed chap.450