NY S05508 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real estate teams to be registered with the department of state.
Title
Requires real estate teams to be registered with the department of state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5508B |
2013-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2013-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5508A |
2013-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07840 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to judiciary