NY S05482 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of electric assisted bicycles unless the packaging contains a notice stating that the operation of such electric assisted bicycle on any public highway or sidewalk is prohibited.
Title
Prohibits the sale of electric assisted bicycles unless the packaging contains a notice stating that the operation of such electric assisted bicycle on any public highway or sidewalk is prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5482A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06960 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES