NY S05482 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a drain tile revolving loan fund; provides low interest loans to farmers.
Title
Establishes a drain tile revolving loan fund; provides low interest loans to farmers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7706 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1076 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1296 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07706 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - tabled