NY S05472 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5472B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5472B
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the reentry of certain foster children after they were discharged from foster care after attaining the age of eighteen for failure to consent or who were discharged from foster care after attaining the age of sixteen but who is or is likely to become homeless.
Title
Provides for the reentry of certain foster children after they were discharged from foster care after attaining the age of eighteen for failure to consent or who were discharged from foster care after attaining the age of sixteen but who is or is likely to become homeless.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5472B |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5472A |
2018-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07555 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - amended on third reading 7555b