NY S05441 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the declaration of a sign as a public nuisance and its removal by order of the commissioner.
Title
Relates to the declaration of a sign as a public nuisance and its removal by order of the commissioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.697 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.727 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00707 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to cities