NY S05434 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7736
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7736
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows assessors of the town of Whitestown and village of New York Mills to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the New York Mills Historical Society for certain parcels of land in such town and village.
Title
Allows assessors of the town of Whitestown and village of New York Mills to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the New York Mills Historical Society for certain parcels of land in such town and village.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7736 |
2011-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.893 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07736 (Same As) 2011-08-17 - signed chap.443