NY S05431 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - VETOED MEMO.80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to payments to rural hospitals that are critical access hospitals.
Title
Relates to payments to rural hospitals that are critical access hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.80 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.467 |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5366b |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1390 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5431A |
2011-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2011-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05366 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - substituted by s5431a