NY S05426 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to gaming in New York state and applying certain proceeds from such gaming to the community development in the locality or region in which such gaming occurs.
Title
Relates to gaming in New York state and applying certain proceeds from such gaming to the community development in the locality or region in which such gaming occurs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-05-24 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2011-05-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |