NY S05419 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from $300 to $725 the monthly rent subsidy payable for housing for a foster child living independently in certain circumstances.
Title
Increases from $300 to $725 the monthly rent subsidy payable for housing for a foster child living independently in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] |
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5419B |
2022-03-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5419A |
2022-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.682 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1283 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02476 (Same As) 2021-12-03 - enacting clause stricken
A01777 (Same As) 2022-05-20 - print number 1777c
A01777 (Same As) 2022-05-20 - print number 1777c