NY A01777 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - print number 1777c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - print number 1777c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from $300 to $725 the monthly rent subsidy payable for housing for a foster child living independently in certain circumstances.
Title
Increases from $300 to $725 the monthly rent subsidy payable for housing for a foster child living independently in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 1777c |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | print number 1777b |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | print number 1777a |
2022-01-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05419 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - referred to ways and means