NY S05377 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5377A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5377A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires manufacturers to meet certain standards with their packaging in New York state to reduce waste; establishes the guidelines and sets a timetable by which manufacturers must comply with these provisions.
Title
Requires manufacturers to meet certain standards with their packaging in New York state to reduce waste; establishes the guidelines and sets a timetable by which manufacturers must comply with these provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5377A |
2016-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04724 (Same As) 2016-04-20 - print number 4724a