NY S05376 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides incentives for productive workers' compensation audits.
Title
Provides incentives for productive workers' compensation audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5376B |
2014-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.385 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1562 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5376A |
2013-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07921 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to labor