NY S05369 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5369A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5369A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the investigation of crimes and crime reporting on college and university campuses.
Title
Relates to the investigation of crimes and crime reporting on college and university campuses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5369A |
2012-03-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2011-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07476 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - print number 7476a