NY S05361 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5361A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5361A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants Peter Guarino retroactive membership with Tier IV status in the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Title
Grants Peter Guarino retroactive membership with Tier IV status in the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5361A |
2024-04-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1572 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05887 (Same As) 2024-04-29 - print number 5887a