NY S05332 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires written notice to a defendant of his or her right to complete court ordered alcohol or substance use treatment in a nonreligious treatment program.
Title
Requires written notice to a defendant of his or her right to complete court ordered alcohol or substance use treatment in a nonreligious treatment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5074 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1041 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |
Same As/Similar To
A05074 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - tabled