NY S05331 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notice of indicated reports of child maltreatment and changes of placement in child protective and voluntary foster care placement and review proceedings.
Title
Relates to notice of indicated reports of child maltreatment and changes of placement in child protective and voluntary foster care placement and review proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2015-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07117 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
A09992 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.299
A09992 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.299