NY S05322 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.320
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.320
Summary
DELETE Authorizes filing of application for real property tax exemption by the town of Ramapo.
Title
DELETE Authorizes filing of application for real property tax exemption by the town of Ramapo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED BY A7580A | |
2009-07-15 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.798 | |
2009-07-15 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-18 | PRINT NUMBER 5322A | |
2009-06-18 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07580 (Same As) 2009-08-11 - signed chap.320
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05322&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |