NY S05304 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to posting the names of individuals who are authorized to sign state contracts; eliminates unfavorable terms in state contracts.
Title
Relates to posting the names of individuals who are authorized to sign state contracts; eliminates unfavorable terms in state contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.251 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5304A |
2022-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.532 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |